WA HB1708 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning facility fees for audio-only telemedicine.
Title
Concerning facility fees for audio-only telemedicine.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 126, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-19 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |