WA HB1703 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to Capital Budget.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to Capital Budget.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning comprehensive school safety planning for public and private K-12 schools.
Title
Concerning comprehensive school safety planning for public and private K-12 schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2018-01-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-25 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Education |