WA HB1702 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Informing students of low-cost course materials for community and technical college courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Informing students of low-cost course materials for community and technical college courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-25HouseChapter 104, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-25HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-25SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2020-01-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-22SenateVote on third reading will be reconsidered.
2020-01-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2.
2020-01-21SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-02SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-08HouseCWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1702&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1702.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1702.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1702.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118710&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1702&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118710&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-22-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1702&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118710&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1702&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback