WA HB1701 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Notifying students of courses with low-cost instructional materials and open educational resources at the four-year institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notifying students of courses with low-cost instructional materials and open educational resources at the four-year institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-08HouseCWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback