WA HB1695 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a priority for the use, reuse, and recycling of construction aggregate and recycled concrete materials in Washington.
Title
Establishing a priority for the use, reuse, and recycling of construction aggregate and recycled concrete materials in Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Effective date 1/1/2016. |
2015-04-29 | House | Chapter 142, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2015-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass ENVI 15 bill proposed by Environment. |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2015-02-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB5480 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.