WA HB1691 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning financial responsibility requirements related to oil spills.
Title
Concerning financial responsibility requirements related to oil spills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 202, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-21 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
88 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
88 | 40 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
88 | 40 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
88 | 40 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
88 | 40 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
88 | 40 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |