WA HB1685 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning resource and assessment centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning resource and assessment centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-01-19HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2024-01-19HouseHSEL - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2024-01-08HouseReferred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.
2024-01-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-15HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.

Same As/Similar To

SB5691 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7415311Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1685&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1685.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1685-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1685-S2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1685%20HBA%20HSEL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1685%20HBR%20HSEL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67232
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1685%20HBR%20HSEL%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128681&actionText=HSEL%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30796&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128681&actionText=HSEL%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31640&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback