WA HB1682 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Washington auto theft prevention authority account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the Washington auto theft prevention authority account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09HouseEffective date 7/1/2023.
2023-05-09HouseChapter 388, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-09HouseGovernor signed.
2023-04-21HouseDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-20SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-18HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2023-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2023-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-04-12SenateFloor amendment
2023-04-12SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-03-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-03-21SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2023-03-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2023-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2023-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2023-02-27HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-20HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-20HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4666080Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1682&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1682.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1682-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1682-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1682-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1682-S%20AMS%20WM%20S2253.3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1682-S%20AMS%20WILS%20S3305.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1682%20HBA%20APP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1682%20HBR%20APP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1682-S%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1682-S%20SBA%20WM%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1682-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1682-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1682-S%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1682-S%20HBR%20SA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1682-S%20HBR%20PL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1682-S%20HBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66656
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66860
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67267
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68211
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68316
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68444
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128660&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30809&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128660&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1682&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128660&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=31090&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128660&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1682&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128660&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1682&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback