WA HB1674 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the prevailing rate of wage based on collective bargaining agreements or other methods if collective bargaining agreements are not available.
Title
Establishing the prevailing rate of wage based on collective bargaining agreements or other methods if collective bargaining agreements are not available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB5493 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.