WA HB1673 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting information relating to the regulation of explosives from public disclosure.
Title
Exempting information relating to the regulation of explosives from public disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 125, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |