WA HB1673 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing the basic education allocation formula to adopt the staffing resources recommended by the quality education council.
Title
Enhancing the basic education allocation formula to adopt the staffing resources recommended by the quality education council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1673&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1673.pdf |