WA HB1672 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions governing the maintenance and disclosure of information related to reports of child abuse and neglect.
Title
Modifying provisions governing the maintenance and disclosure of information related to reports of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-10 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |