WA HB1670 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the appointment process for the chairperson and vice chairperson of the joint administrative rules review committee.
Title
Concerning the appointment process for the chairperson and vice chairperson of the joint administrative rules review committee.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Keith Goehner [R] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] |
Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-12-20 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5506 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.