WA HB1669 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing minimum crew size on certain trains.
Title
Establishing minimum crew size on certain trains.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB5846 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.