WA HB1665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing transparency on the effect of tax expenditures on the state's budget.
Title
Providing transparency on the effect of tax expenditures on the state's budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1665&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1665.pdf |