WA HB1661 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the department of children, youth, and families.
Title
Creating the department of children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Effective date 10/19/2017*. |
2017-07-06 | House | Chapter 6, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-03-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-15 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5498 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.