WA HB1658 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning paraeducators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning paraeducators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-07HouseChapter 268, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18HousePassed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-12SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-01SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-26HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-19HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-28HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1658&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1658.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1658-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1658-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1658-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118646&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1658&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118646&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1658&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118646&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1658&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback