WA HB1656 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a community aviation revitalization loan program.
Title
Establishing a community aviation revitalization loan program.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-20 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |