WA HB1655 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing guidelines for government procurement and use of automated decision systems in order to protect consumers, improve transparency, and create more market predictability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing guidelines for government procurement and use of automated decision systems in order to protect consumers, improve transparency, and create more market predictability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-22HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB5527 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-23 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback