WA HB1654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the procurement and use of facial recognition technology by government entities in Washington state and privacy rights relating to facial recognition technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the procurement and use of facial recognition technology by government entities in Washington state and privacy rights relating to facial recognition technology.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-22HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB5528 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback