WA HB1650 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commercial solicitation.
Title
Concerning commercial solicitation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2021-12-16 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 190 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 190 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 190 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 190 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 190 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 190 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 190 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 36 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |