WA HB1649 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the advisory committee on hunters and fishers with disabilities.
Title
Concerning the advisory committee on hunters and fishers with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 21, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2022-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-25 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-12-15 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |