WA HB1647 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mandatory rest periods for pilots.
Title
Concerning mandatory rest periods for pilots.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 123, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5563 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.