WA HB1646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning confinement in juvenile rehabilitation facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning confinement in juvenile rehabilitation facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09HouseChapter 322, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18HousePassed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2019-04-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-03-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-26SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-05House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-25HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-25HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-06HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Same As/Similar To

SB5737 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1646&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1646.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1646-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1646-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1646-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1646-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1646-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118594&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1646&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118594&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1646&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118594&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1646&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback