WA HB1644 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing responsive, needs-based training opportunities for addressing the teacher shortage through improved teacher recruitment, teacher selection, and teacher onboarding and induction.
Title
Providing responsive, needs-based training opportunities for addressing the teacher shortage through improved teacher recruitment, teacher selection, and teacher onboarding and induction.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1644&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1644.pdf |