WA HB1641 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the business and occupation and public utility tax exemption for custom farming and hauling farm products.
Title
Restoring the business and occupation and public utility tax exemption for custom farming and hauling farm products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 119, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 5:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-24 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2021-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |