WA HB1640 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying disclosure requirements for private investment information received by the University of Washington consolidated endowment fund.
Title
Modifying disclosure requirements for private investment information received by the University of Washington consolidated endowment fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Alexander [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Lynn Kessler [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-07 | Chapter 394, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-07 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | HEWD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5526 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.