WA HB1639 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a specialized child care pilot program for vulnerable children.
Title
Creating a specialized child care pilot program for vulnerable children.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-15 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |