WA HB1638 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Promoting immunity against vaccine preventable diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting immunity against vaccine preventable diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-10HouseChapter 362, 2019 Laws PV.
2019-05-10HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23HousePassed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-17SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05HouseFloor amendment
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-15HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1638&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1638.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1638.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1638.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1638.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118586&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1638&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118586&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-17-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1638&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118586&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1638&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback