WA HB1630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of naturopathy.
Title
Concerning the practice of naturopathy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5752 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.