WA HB1627 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing nonprofit corporation facilities financing by the Washington state housing finance commission.
Title
Addressing nonprofit corporation facilities financing by the Washington state housing finance commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-09 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |