WA HB1626 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning coverage for colorectal screening tests under medical assistance programs.
Title
Concerning coverage for colorectal screening tests under medical assistance programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | House | Chapter 299, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-10 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |