WA HB1623 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regional economic development visions and action plans.
Title
Concerning regional economic development visions and action plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-03 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |