WA HB1623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the extent to which Washington residents are at risk of rolling blackouts and power supply inadequacy events.
Title
Addressing the extent to which Washington residents are at risk of rolling blackouts and power supply inadequacy events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-14 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-12-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |