WA HB1620 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the response to extreme weather events.
Title
Addressing the response to extreme weather events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-14 | House | CED - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
2021-12-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 52 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |