WA HB1607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning notice of material changes to the operations or governance structure of participants in the health care marketplace.
Title
Concerning notice of material changes to the operations or governance structure of participants in the health care marketplace.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 267, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |