WA HB1606 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring transportation benefit districts to hold public hearings prior to imposing fees or charges by a vote of the governing board.
Title
Requiring transportation benefit districts to hold public hearings prior to imposing fees or charges by a vote of the governing board.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] |
Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-08 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |