WA HB1604 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the Washington state center for childhood deafness and hearing loss to the Washington center for deaf and hard of hearing youth.
Title
Changing the Washington state center for childhood deafness and hearing loss to the Washington center for deaf and hard of hearing youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 266, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 3; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |