WA HB1604 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the permitted uses of surplus funds from boater education card fees to certain boating safety programs and activities.
Title
Concerning expanding the permitted uses of surplus funds from boater education card fees to certain boating safety programs and activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB5442 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1604&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1604.pdf |