WA HB1603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the child support economic table based on recommendations of the child support work group.
Title
Updating the child support economic table based on recommendations of the child support work group.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-09 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |