WA HB1597 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 7/1/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 7/1/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of state and local tax programs.
Title
Concerning the administration of state and local tax programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date 7/1/2010*. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 106, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-29 | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 2:15 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Finance. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-26 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-09 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-20 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-12 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-02 | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5569 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.