WA HB1592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Washington children's educational savings account program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Washington children's educational savings account program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-15HouseCWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM.
2019-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB5704 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback