WA HB1571 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a community care and supportive services program for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a community care and supportive services program for veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-19SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM.
2018-02-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-22SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-01-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-01-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-18SenateFloor amendment
2018-01-18SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2018-01-16SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-05-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2017-05-23SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-05SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.
2017-05-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2017-05-01SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-03-29SenateSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-03SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.
2017-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-21HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-07HouseCDHT - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback