WA HB1569 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting unit owners in common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting unit owners in common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-09HouseHOUS - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6432New CodeSee Bill Text
6432090Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6432170Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6434New CodeSee Bill Text
6434304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6434372Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6438New CodeSee Bill Text
6438020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6438045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6490New CodeSee Bill Text
6490080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6490405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6490495Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback