WA HB1569 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning marketing the degradability of products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning marketing the degradability of products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseEffective date 7/1/2020.
2019-05-07HouseChapter 265, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-03-19SenateAnd refer to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-03-19SenateAWNP - Majority; without recommendation.
2019-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2019-03-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-11House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy.
2019-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-14HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-14HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-14HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1569&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1569.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1569-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1569-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1569-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1569-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118417&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1569&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118417&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1569&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback