WA HB1561 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring participation on the oversight board for children, youth, and families by current or former foster youth, individuals with current or previous experience in the juvenile justice system, a physician with experience working with children or youth, and individuals residing east of the Cascade mountain range.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring participation on the oversight board for children, youth, and families by current or former foster youth, individuals with current or previous experience in the juvenile justice system, a physician with experience working with children or youth, and individuals residing east of the Cascade mountain range.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21HouseChapter 429, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-25HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18HousePassed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-28SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-21SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-06HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1561&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1561.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1561.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1561.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118398&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1561&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118398&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1561&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118398&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1561&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback