WA HB1558 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing membership in the Washington public safety employees' retirement system for employees who provide nursing care to, or ensure the custody and safety of, offender, probationary, and patient populations in institutions and centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing membership in the Washington public safety employees' retirement system for employees who provide nursing care to, or ensure the custody and safety of, offender, probationary, and patient populations in institutions and centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-23HouseChapter 241, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-23HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06SenateAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-18SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-13HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-13HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-13HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-13HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback