WA HB1551 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing lead in cookware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing lead in cookware.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-13HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-13HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Same As/Similar To

SB5605 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-27 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4321b110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4321b300Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback