WA HB1550 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting eligible children in need of additional preparation to be successful in kindergarten by establishing the transition to kindergarten program.
Title
Assisting eligible children in need of additional preparation to be successful in kindergarten by establishing the transition to kindergarten program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-11 | House | Chapter 420, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2023-04-20 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-14 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 225 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 300 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 216 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 216 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 216 | 655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |