WA HB1546 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the proposed department of natural resources' marbled murrelet long-term conservation strategy.
Title
Concerning the proposed department of natural resources' marbled murrelet long-term conservation strategy.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5547 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.